THE RETIRED NURSES NATIONAL HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was created in 1937 to construct and provide a Home for Retired Nurses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 23 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Smith | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr Steve Allen | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Griffiths | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JANUARY 2002, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCTOBER 2004 AND SCHEME DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2009, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 2010 . AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT ("THE OBJECTS") OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1 THE RELIEF OF MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE NURSING PROFESSION WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BY: A) THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION; OR B) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR C) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR D) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. 2) IF RESIDENTIAL VACANCIES EXIST WHICH CANNOT BE FILLED BY MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE NURSING PROFESSION THE TRUSTEE MAY OFFER ACCOMMODATION AND RELATED SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF PROFESSIONS ALLIED TO MEDICINE. 3) IF AND SO FAR AS IT IS NOT ABLE TO FILL THE VACANCIES IN THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY IN THE MANNER SPECIFIED ABOVE THE TRUSTEES MAY OFFER ACCOMMODATION AND RELATED SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC WHO IS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF THE ELDERLY
40-42 EBURY STREET
LONDON
SW1W 0LZ
- Phone:
- 020 7730 8263
- Email:
- rnnh@fote.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window