Governing document THE RETIRED NURSES NATIONAL HOME

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JANUARY 2002, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCTOBER 2004 AND SCHEME DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2009, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 2010 . AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT ("THE OBJECTS") OF THE CHARITY ARE: 3.1 THE RELIEF OF MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE NURSING PROFESSION WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BY: A) THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION; OR B) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR C) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR D) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. 2) IF RESIDENTIAL VACANCIES EXIST WHICH CANNOT BE FILLED BY MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE NURSING PROFESSION THE TRUSTEE MAY OFFER ACCOMMODATION AND RELATED SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF PROFESSIONS ALLIED TO MEDICINE. 3) IF AND SO FAR AS IT IS NOT ABLE TO FILL THE VACANCIES IN THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY IN THE MANNER SPECIFIED ABOVE THE TRUSTEES MAY OFFER ACCOMMODATION AND RELATED SERVICES AND FACILITIES TO ANY MEMBER OF THE PUBLIC WHO IS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.