VOLUNTEER CENTRE MILTON KEYNES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Porviding support for local voluntary organisations in recruiting, retaining and managing volunteers and assisting individuals and groups in Milton Keynes in finding the most appropriate volunteering roles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 26 February 2002: Standard registration
- 13 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE VOLUNTEER CENTRE - MILTON KEYNES (Working name)
- MILTON KEYNES VOLUNTEER CONNECTIONS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.78k | £138.03k | £164.94k | £161.31k | £123.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.37k | £134.76k | £158.74k | £165.57k | £130.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 07 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 07 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 02 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 02 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 13 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 13 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 13 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 DECEMBER 2006 AND 12 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTARY PARTICIPATION IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICES AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES AND ALSO IN OTHER AREAS IN ENGLAND AND WALES AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COMMITTEE IN PARTICULAR BY:- 1. ACTING AS A RECRUITING AGENCY FOR VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS; 2. ADVISING, INFORMING AND GUIDING PERSONS WILLING TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY SERVICE; 3. FACILITATING AND ASSISTING ACTIVITIES AND ORGANISATIONS IN THE USE OF VOLUNTEERS; 4. PROVIDING A FOCAL POINT FOR VOLUNTEERS, AND THEREBY ENCOURAGING THE EXCHANGE OF IDEAS ON VOLUNTEERING FOR CHARITABLE WORK; 5. PROMOTING SPECIFIC PROJECTS, CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS FOR TRAINING AND SUPPORTING VOLUNTEERS AND FOR OTHER PURPOSES IN SUPPORT OF THE MAIN OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY; 6. INITIATING AND UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window