HIGH SALVINGTON MILL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and operation of High Salvington Windmill as a working Mill, tourist attraction and educational resource and the restoration of Glynde Windpump.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucinda frances Jaffray Brooks | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Hopkins | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Romero | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ferdousi Henna Chowdhury | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Gaskell | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Lipscombe | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Sparkes | Trustee | 04 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edward Nowak | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Bernard Minter | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Jeffrey Thomas Best | Trustee | 15 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Raymond Campbell | Trustee | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL DOROTHY MARSDEN | Trustee | 08 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Richard Allen Wickett | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.99k | £12.68k | £16.61k | £15.89k | £15.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.13k | £11.99k | £6.45k | £7.42k | £6.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH APRIL 2001, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28TH JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF THE POST MILL AT HIGH SALVINGTON, WORTHING AFORESAID KNOWN AS HIGH SALVINGTON MILL AS A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST FOR THE EDUCATION AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF WORTHING IN THE COUNTY OF WEST SUSSEX.
Area of benefit
WORTHING
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 FURZEHOLME
WORTHING
BN13 3BS
- Phone:
- 00000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window