THE PEOPLE'S EVANGELISTIC MISSION (NORTH SHIELDS) ENDOWED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church services continue on Sunday mornings and evenings. Also Bible study on Tuesdays and prayer meetings on Saturday and Tuesday mornings. Continue to have links with the community through Penny Whistle, an activity for mothers and young children. Also a Bible club at a local primary school, plus visits to local nursing homes. Have recently become part of Christians Against Poverty, offering adv
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 21 March 2002: Standard registration
- NORTH SHIELDS EVANGELICAL CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RONNIE SWIFT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET RUTH SWIFT | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|||||
JANINE LOWE | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lowe | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.88k | £21.53k | £20.75k | £22.89k | £20.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.97k | £11.73k | £13.24k | £11.46k | £9.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 2 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE PEOPLE'S EVANGELISTIC MISSION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 LABURNUM GARDENS
JARROW
NE32 5NF
- Phone:
- 01914895549
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window