SUFFOLK LOWLAND SEARCH AND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SuLSaR's operates under a service level agreement with Suffolk Police, the primary role is to support the police in the search for missing vulnerable people by the provision and maintenance of a trained Search and Rescue team to operate primarily (but not by way of limitation) in Suffolk and the surrounding areas. This also incorporates NSARDA Suffolk search dogs who are part of the SuLSaR Team
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 05 April 2002: Standard registration
- National Search and Rescue dog Association Suffolk or NSARDA Suffolk (Working name)
- SULSAR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDY KING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicholas Warren Adams | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Crouchman | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Alden | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Lavender | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Durrant | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Glendinning | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | 01/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.54k | £31.63k | £47.56k | £45.68k | £68.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.02k | £41.17k | £42.18k | £43.03k | £41.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.28k | £7.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH OF NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 17TH MARCH 2002 AND 26 NOVEMBER 2006 as amended on 19 May 2023
Charitable objects
("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENTS OR NATURAL HAZARDS BY PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A TRAINED SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM TO OPERATE PRIMARILY (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) IN SUFFOLK AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suffolk Lowland Search & Rescue
1 Stag Park
Old A45
Woolpit
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP30 9FX
- Phone:
- 07825412931
- Email:
- secretary@sulsar.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window