ST OSMUNDS COMMUNITY SPORTS CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of recreational/leisure facilities for the people of Dorchester and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 22 April 2002: Standard registration
- 05 August 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.26k | £135.42k | £101.37k | £112.47k | £105.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.48k | £105.29k | £100.04k | £108.21k | £100.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUPILS OF ST OSMUNDS CE MIDDLE SCHOOL AND THE INHABITANTS OF DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
THE PUPILS OF ST OSMUNDS CE MIDDLE SCHOOL AND THE INHABITANTS OF DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window