RECOM: BRIDGING THE IT GAP IN THE COMMUNITY LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of refurbished computers and IT training and support to the disadvantaged and disabled.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £594 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 2002: Standard registration
- 10 August 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 10 August 2022: Funds transferred to 1117345 HEART OF ENGLAND COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- RECOM (Working name)
- RECOM LTD (Working name)
- RECOM: BRIDGING THE IT GAP IN THE COMMUNITY (Previous name)
- RECOM: NATIONAL ORGANISATION FOR THE RE-UTILISATION OF COMPUTERS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.15k | £75.59k | £109.85k | £109.37k | £63.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.98k | £75.95k | £85.64k | £107.98k | £71.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.00k | £50.50k | £57.94k | £54.54k | £594 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 06 September 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 9 MARCH 2002 as amended on 30 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO BY REASON OF POVERTY, DISABILITY, YOUTH, AGE OR INFIRMITY ARE IN NEED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMPUTER EQUIPMENT 3.2 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS BY THE PROVISION OF COMPUTER EQUIPMENT, SERVICES, SUPPORT AND TRAINING 3.3 FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED TO CLAUSES 3.1 AND 3.2 AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window