Financial history BROXBOURNE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1090504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.21k £11.40k £16.18k £56.88k £56.08k
Total expenditure £71.08k £7.09k £24.35k £52.54k £54.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A