BROXBOURNE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A monthly meeting with speaker, open to all members, and smaller special interest groups that organise their own programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 08 February 2002: Standard registration
- BROXBOURNE U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer May Murtagh | Chair | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Sutterby | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Anderson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Hutchings | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Elve | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jean Beeston | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Antonietta Cusumano | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Patricia Harrison | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Common | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Veronica Driscoll | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Green | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Maureen Watkins | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.21k | £11.40k | £16.18k | £56.88k | £56.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.08k | £7.09k | £24.35k | £52.54k | £54.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/05/2001 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 20 May 2021 as amended on 29 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Coppings
HODDESDON
Hertfordshire
EN11 9NJ
- Phone:
- 07946 702998
- Email:
- broxbourneu3a@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window