Trustees BROXBOURNE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1090504

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer May Murtagh | Chair | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Sutterby | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Anderson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Hutchings | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Elve | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jean Beeston | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Antonietta Cusumano | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Patricia Harrison | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Common | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joan Veronica Driscoll | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Green | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Maureen Watkins | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.