ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDERS UNITING PARENTS (ADDUP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support families with children with ADHD and Associated Disorders offering: School Holiday Activity Projects; After School Clubs; Drama Group; Parent/Child Training Courses; Parents Support Group Meetings; Family Outings; Christmas Party; A Drop-in Service; Library; Website; Schools/Professionals Training; Outreach Work; Representation at Meetings; Conference, Volunteer Mentoring Programme
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 27 March 2002: Standard registration
- ADDUP (Working name)
- ADD+UP (Previous name)
- ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDERS UNITING PARENTS (ADD+UP) (Previous name)
- ATTENTION DEFICIT DISORDERS UNITING PARENTS IN HAVERING, BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (ADD + UP) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Gordon | Chair | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amy Howard-Love | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Huzzey | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ina Ramancauske | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Berkovitch-Perry | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Nye | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Todd | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA JULIE REID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDSAY MARSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.36k | £133.07k | £225.29k | £112.85k | £166.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.20k | £108.81k | £163.93k | £183.03k | £167.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUL 1999 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEP 2002 AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
I) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TREATMENTS TO THOSE AFFECTED BY ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDERS (AND ANY CO-MORBIDITIES), THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, PARTICULARLY IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HAVERING, BARKING AND DAGENHAM; AND II)THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION REGARDING ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDERS (AND ANY CO-MORBIDITIES).
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF HAVERING, BARKING AND DAGENHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Addup
59 Billet Lane
HORNCHURCH
RM11 1AX
- Phone:
- 01708454040
- Email:
- addup@addup.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window