Sinfonia Smith Square

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Southbank Sinfonia is the UK's Orchestral Academy. Each year, Southbank Sinfonia selects 33 outstanding young players to take part in an intensive eight-month season of performance and professional development, to train them for their career as a professional musician.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£3,781,243
Donations and legacies | £2.31m | |
Charitable activities | £1.10m | |
Other trading activities | £354.71k | |
Investments | £23.03k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,733,417
Raising funds | £322.35k | |
Charitable activities | £2.25m | |
Other | £159.18k |
-£9,866 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £481.53k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.25m | |
Retained for future use | £1.05m |
People

61 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2002: Standard registration
- 28 August 2020: Funds received from 282456 A M DOMMETT CHARITABLE TRUST
- Southbank Sinfonia at St John's Smith Square (Working name)
- SOUTHBANK SINFONIA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Laurence | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Frederick Starr | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Usman Peguero | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracy Elisabeth Long | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Charles Newsome-Hubbard | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|||||
ROBIN JAMES FAWCETT | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Edith Monfries | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Genevieve Ellen Joy | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Hall | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Simon Timothy Over | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09m | £1.02m | £2.90m | £2.38m | £3.78m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.28m | £998.97k | £936.96k | £2.99m | £2.73m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £100.00k | £58.97k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £633.94k | £898.21k | £1.07m | £1.24m | £2.31m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £343.84k | £89.17k | £88.90k | £428.30k | £354.71k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £88.16k | £19.51k | £137.99k | £699.56k | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £20.96k | £15.20k | £6.21k | £15.54k | £23.03k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £1.59m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £4.65k | £0 | £0 | £7.92k | £147.98k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £938.38k | £810.06k | £830.23k | £2.46m | £2.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £341.89k | £147.26k | £106.73k | £532.41k | £322.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £42.63k | £39.40k | £39.51k | £53.07k | £65.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £643 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £41.66k | £0 | £0 | £159.18k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £27.83k | £31.81k | £1.91m | £2.22m | £2.12m | |
|
Long-term investments | £492.89k | £329.27k | £351.41k | £294.75k | £282.47k | |
|
Other assets | £192.87k | £350.60k | £898.29k | £943.55k | £2.09m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £94.41k | £108.99k | £594.49k | £668.20k | £665.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2015 as amended on 15 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE:- A. TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT PARTICULARLY AMONG YOUNG MUSICIANS IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING OPPORTUNITIES TO TRAIN AND ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, BY MAINTAINING AN ORCHESTRA TO PROVIDE CONCERTS AND MASTER-CLASSES; AND C. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST YOUNG MUSICIANS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND BURSARIES."
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St John's Smith Square
Smith Square
LONDON
SW1P 3HA
- Phone:
- 02079210370
- Email:
- info@southbanksinfonia.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window