FRIENDS OF SOUTHWOLD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it. Develop more extended relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 11 February 2002: Standard registration
- FOSS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sheryl Preen | Chair | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Reid | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Clews | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Clark | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Jordan | Trustee | 22 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.48k | £9.30k | £5.44k | £4.07k | £12.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.99k | £2.69k | £19.50k | £748 | £14.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 316 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 July 2024 | 389 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 NOVEMBER 2001 as amended on 18 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWOLD C P SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southwold Primary School
Holm Way
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX26 3UU
- Phone:
- 01869 324061
- Email:
- Foss@southwold.oxon.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window