EAST SURREY DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICES (ESDAS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of outreach and associated services to survivors of domestic abuse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,254,186
Donations and legacies | £51.61k | |
Charitable activities | £1.18m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £20.42k | |
Other | £3.16k |
Total expenditure:
£1,129,276
Raising funds | £3.39k | |
Charitable activities | £1.13m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £711,347 from 12 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.13m | |
Retained for future use | £124.91k |
People

24 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 June 2002: Standard registration
- EAST SURREY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FORUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Diane Arnold | Chair | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Keen | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Toluwase Victoria Oladosu | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Claire Berry | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan William Stanley Swain | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Nicola Matier | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Vinall | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £496.39k | £721.32k | £814.29k | £1.07m | £1.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £524.67k | £641.35k | £741.75k | £894.49k | £1.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.45k | N/A | £196.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £306.13k | £393.99k | £273.54k | £707.10k | £711.35k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £53.64k | £54.73k | £21.95k | £51.61k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £656.89k | £748.02k | £1.04m | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £999 | £876 | £1.99k | £20.42k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £9.79k | £10.66k | £1.04k | £3.16k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £641.35k | £741.08k | £893.64k | £1.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £670 | £854 | £3.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.30k | £2.34k | £5.86k | £5.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £352.57k | £692.45k | £788.05k | £928.48k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £58.11k | £325.45k | £246.77k | £262.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 23RD JUNE 1998 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10TH JUNE 2002. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED AND ARE SUFFERING FROM DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND ANY CHILDREN OF SUCH PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAST SURREY DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICES
REDHILL CHAMBERS
2D HIGH STREET
REDHILL
SURREY
RH1 1RJ
- Phone:
- 01737771350
- Email:
- michelle@esdas.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window