SLAIDBURN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main aim of the charity is the promotion of the general benefit of the present ecclesiastical Parish of Slaidburn.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 22 September 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Allan Johnson | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Harvey Robinson | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Parker | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Waterworth | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA VALERIE BLAKEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.08k | £38.65k | £28.39k | £34.22k | £37.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.08k | £25.04k | £33.33k | £37.97k | £32.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.33k | £26.46k | £3.13k | £1.45k | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22ND MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SLAIDBURN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SLAIDBURN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Slaidburn Village Hall
26 Chapel Street
Slaidburn
CLITHEROE
BB7 3ES
- Phone:
- 01200446555
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window