MID BUCKS BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Association shall be to promote and further the craft of Beekeeping for the public benefit. We run training courses for new and experienced beekeepers, mount exhibitions to promote awareness of beekeeping and provide facilities for our members to exchange information and give mutual assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 23 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Newman | Chair | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josef Loxey | Trustee | 23 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Knatchbull | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Oakley | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Spiller | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Ward | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hamilton | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Tice | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa-Ann Hurley | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Latham Palmer | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine Hood-Liles | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
George Edmund Bull | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Harvey Dadswell | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.51k | £9.93k | £12.21k | £16.86k | £16.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.63k | £12.93k | £10.69k | £14.65k | £14.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN THE GI
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Windsor Road
Pitstone
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
Bedfordshire
LU7 9GD
- Phone:
- 07766220262
- Email:
- treasurer@mbbka.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window