HOPE INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AGENCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOPE International Development Agency UK works with communities in extreme poverty to bring comprehensive transformation. We provide access to clean water - an essential basic resource; equip and empower men, women and children, with training in sanitation and hygiene; and strengthen livelihoods through women's self-help groups, and environmental protection and food security measures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambodia
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 12 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSANNA Seymour ARMSTRONG | Chair | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Billen Kebede Tesissa | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simeon Luke Paton | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Newport | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARISSA MARY POULSON | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.17k | £75.06k | £142.13k | £149.75k | £172.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.61k | £78.62k | £146.22k | £147.01k | £171.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY ASSISTING (WHETHER BY WAY OF GRANT OR OTHERWISE) POOR PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES TO BE SELF-SUFFICIENT BY PROVIDING THEM WITH THE NECESSARY FACILITIES, SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE; TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 WEST HILL ROAD
LONDON
SW18 5HN
- Phone:
- 020 8875 1885
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window