Financial history MILFORD SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1091769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.66k £12.01k £17.84k £19.11k £8.86k
Total expenditure £9.44k £9.47k £17.11k £18.70k £6.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A