ASH BRANCH U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education and training with particular emphasis on the health and welfare of people over 50 or no longer in full time employment.The aim is to use the particular skills and experience of members for the benefit of all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 March 2002: Standard registration
- ASH U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Henry Monds | Chair | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judy D'sa | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Milton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Dorothy Monds | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Evans | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Wilson | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stratford | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Wilson | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Barnard | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gay Buckingham | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.02k | £3.20k | £15.84k | £14.53k | £13.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.84k | £3.23k | £18.78k | £14.14k | £12.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 4 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
ASH AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Springfield Road
Ash Vale
ALDERSHOT
Hampshire
GU12 5EN
- Phone:
- 07761949478
- Email:
- Secretary@ashu3a.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window