KITTY CAT RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 10 April 2002: Standard registration
- 10 August 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 10 August 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 20 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN SLOUGH AND ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, NEGLECT OR MALTREATMENT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A RESCUE AND RE-HOMING SERVICE AND A SANCTUARY FOR THE TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT ACCOMMODATION OF SUCH CATS.
Area of benefit
SLOUGH AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window