Financial history THE GRIFFIN CLUB

Charity number: 1092071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £21.17k £13.42k £14.55k £13.77k £14.59k
Total expenditure £24.27k £12.67k £14.61k £11.39k £9.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A