BLUE SKY ARTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating primarily in the Berkshire region Blue Sky Arts seeks to provide advice and training through various media , projects have included IT training , Photography , Writing classes , Film and Art Festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
Governance
- 14 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GEORGE WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.57k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 January 2025 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2023 | 337 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 February 2022 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 16 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF BLACK ARTS IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE COMMUNITY AND BY THE DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC UNDERSTANDING AND PARTICIPATION IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IN PARTICULAR AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF READING AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFORE PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE. BLUE SKY ARTS DEFINES BLACK ARTS AS THE CULTURE AND ARTISTIC ENDEAVOURS OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN, AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN AND ASIAN ORIGIN, AND THE BENEFICIARIES OF THIS WORK MAY BE ANY MEMBER OF THE COMMUNITY IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR CULTURAL ORIGIN.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND IN PARTICULAR AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF READING AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Southcote Mill
Southcote Farm Lane
Reading
RG30 3DZ
- Phone:
- 07966232740
- Email:
- goodgroove1@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window