SMETHWICK YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/Training Medical/Health/Sickness Disability Relief of Poverty Arts/culture Sport/recreation Environment/Conservation/Heritage Economic/Community development/Employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sandwell
Governance
- 11 February 2002: Standard registration
- S.Y.C.C. (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kuldeep Singh Deol | Chair | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jagjevan Singh Samra | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarbjit Singh | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
BHERVINDER SINGH | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Harjinder Malhi | Trustee | 28 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PARBINDER KAUR | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|||||
GURPAL SINGH | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
BALBIR SINGH BHAJAM BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £493.20k | £373.94k | £396.44k | £372.67k | £439.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £533.80k | £393.18k | £483.35k | £446.49k | £387.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £245.82k | N/A | £112.71k | £124.06k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.00k | £33.16k | £10.33k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF SANDWELL AND IN PARTICULAR THE AREA OF SMETHWICK AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICT (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATION IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. 3) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF SANDWELL AND IN PARTICULAR THE AREA OF SMETHWICK AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRINITY POINT
1 TRINITY ST
SMETHWICK
WEST MIDLANDS
B67 7AA
- Phone:
- 01215658870
- Email:
- luke@sycc.biz
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window