THE INDEPENDENT BIBLE BAPTIST CHURCH OF BURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding Sunday worship services Preaching and teaching from the bible Holding youth meetings on Fridays Teaching Sunday school for children. Reaching out into the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bury
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 July 2003: Standard registration
- BIBLE BAPTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON JAMES WATTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT NEIL CAPPELLI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN WILLIAM NUTTALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.99k | £47.87k | £49.78k | £53.11k | £50.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.60k | £37.05k | £43.72k | £40.38k | £43.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY TEACHING, PREACHING AND PROPAGATING THE DOCTRINES, PRINCIPLES AND BELIEFS AND TEACHING OF GOD AND OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BIBLE, WHICH IS THE WORD OF GOD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE BURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bible Baptist Church
59 Wood Street
BURY
BL8 2QU
- Phone:
- 07796004618
- Email:
- bbchurchbury@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window