BLUNDERBUS THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 1091094
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Touring Children's Theatre Company
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Total income: £364,833
Total expenditure: £397,957
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 March 2002: Standard registration
- 26 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.98k | £327.14k | £603.75k | £295.76k | £364.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.64k | £336.89k | £529.98k | £365.05k | £397.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £603.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £1 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £528.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 28 February 2017 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 28 February 2017 | 120 days late |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 JULY, 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window