Trustees THE BRIDFORD TRUST
Charity Number: 1091188

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Jones | Chair | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas David Honey | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Hawkins | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth John de Graaff | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Joseph Dunkley | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Dowding | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Cronin | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.