DAISY 2000

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General, with particular emphasis on Caithness, Scotland
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS ROLAND FLEMING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES ROLAND FLEMING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.30k | £4.76k | £5.33k | £5.79k | £5.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.18k | £1.20k | £7.50k | £4.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") THAT IS TO SAY FOR ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AND/OR ANY BODY ASSOCIATION TRUST UNDERTAKING OR OTHER INSTITUTION (CORPORATE OR OTHERWISE) FOR THE TIME BEING ESTABLISHED (WHETHER IN ENGLAND OR ELSEWHERE) EXCLUSIVELY FOR A CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (AS DEFINED BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AND FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND MY BE EXPENDED FOR THE OBJECTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION BETWEEN CAPITAL AND INCOME AND NO PART THEREOF SHALL BE TREATED AS PERMANENT ENDOWMENT WITHIN THE MEANING OF THAT EXPRESSION IN S96(3) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 WORLD WIDE "THE AREA OF BENEFIT")
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mead
Turkdean
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL54 3NY
- Phone:
- 01452 670981
- Email:
- daisycaithness@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window