Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST AUGUSTINE'S C.E.P. SCHOOL
Charity number: 1091848

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lora Whicher | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA HUSTON | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Armstrong | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Wood | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Selina Young | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Rosa Munoz Gonzalez | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Morgan | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Reilly | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Kimbrough | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Duncan | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Radford | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Wilson | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Kingsbury | Trustee | 17 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.