Trustees SIMON DE MONTFORT SOCIETY
Charity number: 1092319

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR DAVID A SNOWDEN BA | Chair | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Powell | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joya Snowden | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hurst | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Coss | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Goodrich | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.