The Friends of St Charles

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING FOR ST CHARLES SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 13 February 2002: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST CHARLES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Foster | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Becky Ryan | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Turner | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Moore | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2019 | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.47k | £6.34k | £1.00k | £7.26k | £8.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.19k | £9.86k | £3.20k | £5.42k | £9.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2019 | 28 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JANUARY 2002 as amended on 01 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE. ST CHARLES RCVA PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Faraday Close
SPENNYMOOR
DL16 7UY
- Phone:
- 01388813506
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window