READING REAL ESTATE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of education in the art and science of Real Estate at the University of Reading Providing financial assistance to students in need Widening access to the real estate profession Offering activities to further learning and the employability of students and graduates Raising funds Sharing expertise and best practice Raising awareness of the School of Real Estate and Planning
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£629,501
Donations and legacies | £557.38k | |
Charitable activities | £385 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £71.73k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£769,884
Raising funds | £833 | |
Charitable activities | £670.10k | |
Other | £98.95k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £99.78k | |
Charitable expenditure | £670.10k |
People

8 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
451 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Reading
Governance
- 26 June 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Michael Miskell | Chair | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Su-Mei Kempe | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ben Ingram | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eamonn D'Arcy | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEAN-PIERRE MARCEL JOSEPH CHOULET | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bartlett Tranter | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angelique Chettiparambil Rajan | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kleio Akrivou | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Taylor | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Susanna Norton | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick James Allen | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Jeremy Mark Ridley | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stafford Murray Lancaster | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|||||
VIRGINIA GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £592.95k | £638.64k | £575.99k | £756.50k | £629.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £574.51k | £484.72k | £583.40k | £583.77k | £769.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £587.41k | £637.49k | £573.10k | £727.74k | £557.38k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £840 | £365 | £0 | £0 | £385 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.70k | £791 | £2.70k | £28.76k | £71.73k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £185 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £505.26k | £456.06k | £531.71k | £547.60k | £670.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.21k | £15 | £7 | £108 | £833 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £68.03k | £28.64k | £51.69k | £36.06k | £98.95k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.14m | £1.31m | £1.32m | £1.47m | £1.42m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £41.48k | £59.47k | £78.52k | £50.19k | £140.51k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 4TH JANUARY 2002 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15TH MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF REAL ESTATE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF READING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS
Area of benefit
READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
University of Reading
Henley Business School
Whiteknights
READING
RG6 6UD
- Phone:
- 01183784191
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window