Concerts for Craswall Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We present classical music concerts annually, raising money to promote music in all its forms and for the maintenance of St Mary's church, Craswall. These comprise a Spring and Autumn chamber concerts in Michaelchurch Escley, and two Summer concerts in Dore Abbey and Craswall. The concerts are organised by local volunteers, with subscriptions from Friends helping to meet the musicians' fees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 14 May 2002: Standard registration
- CONCERTS FOR CRASWALL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Michael Milford | Chair | 20 March 2020 |
|
|||
Jill Elizabeth Hollingsworth | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||
Julie Holmes | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|||
Linda Williams | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|||
PAULINE ANN GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.51k | £3.17k | £6.84k | £17.75k | £12.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.59k | £1.84k | £4.17k | £12.11k | £12.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 13 APRIL 2002 as amended on 12 Oct 2018 as amended on 13 Dec 2018 as amended on 29 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES; AND TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WITHIN THE PARISH OF CRASWALL, INCLUDING BY ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH CRASWALL AND OTHER PROPERTIES OWNED AND MANAGED BY THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CRASWALL AND OTHER PROPERTIES OWNED AND MANAGED BY THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Forest House
Craswall
HEREFORD
HR2 0PN
- Phone:
- 01981510112
- Email:
- info@concertsforcraswall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window