Trustees BURE PARK PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1091324

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorette Vidler | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Wastie | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Arthur | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Louise Fyson | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Sharp | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Rowell | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Copcutt | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Coleman | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Sharp | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.