VICTORIA PARK HARRIERS AND TOWER HAMLETS AC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating community based sports facilities and activities and community development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 23 April 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ROBINSON | Chair | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Simon Wharton | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Hirst | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan MacDonald | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alf Vickers | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Dos Santos | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Wong | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Venables Ms | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CORNELIA ABE-MINALE | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.64k | £64.72k | £102.51k | £111.28k | £105.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.13k | £82.05k | £117.65k | £111.50k | £81.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19 NOVEMBER, 2001 AS AMENDED ON 16 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN EAST LONDON WITH THE OBJECT OF PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION AND IN PARTICULAR ATHLETICS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE WHO RESIDE AND WORK IN THE SAID AREA.
Area of benefit
EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victoria Park Harriers
St Augustine's Hall
Cadogan Terrace
London
E9 5EG
- Phone:
- 123456
- Email:
- info@vphthac.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window