Accounts and annual returns THE LYDIARDS LINK

Charity number: 1093200
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 04 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 11 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required