Financial history THE LYDIARDS LINK

Charity number: 1093200
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £955 £1.12k £1.47k £1.34k £1.59k
Total expenditure £1.79k £1.26k £1.69k £1.00k £1.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A