Financial history FORGET ME NOT FOUNDATION ROMANIA

Charity Number: 1091442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.80k £1.90k £1.81k £2.93k £19.91k
Total expenditure £6.85k £120 £1.42k £5.54k £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A