Accounts and annual returns IMPARTATION NETWORK

Charity number: 1092966
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 13 February 2008 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 26 September 2006 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 23 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required