MUSIC FOR AUTISM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to give concerts for the benefit of children with autism and to make grants to schools or organisations which benefit children with autism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 2002: Standard registration
- 24 May 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 May 2021: Funds transferred to 289106 ORCHESTRA OF ST JOHN'S LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.89k | £99.54k | £47.88k | £32.24k | £100.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.95k | £72.58k | £65.49k | £39.51k | £146.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 04 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 04 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | 23 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9 MAY 2002 AND 22 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND PERSONS VARIOUSLY DIAGNOSED WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDERS AND/OR NON COMMUNICATING DISORDERS AND/OR PERSONS WITH AUTISTIC TENDENCIES. B) TO RELIEVE DISTRESS AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND PERSONS VARIOUSLY DIAGNOSED WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDERS AND/OR NON COMMUNICATING DISORDERS AND/OR PERSONS WITH AUTISTIC TENDENCIES AND THEIR CARERS, PRINCIPALLY THROUGH LIVE CONCERTS AND OTHER MUSIC EVENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE, BERKSHIRE AND LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window