Financial history WOKING SEA RANGERS-SRS WAKEFUL

Charity Number: 1091499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.82k £24.00k £8.40k £4.63k £11.11k
Total expenditure £20.35k £22.00k £7.60k £5.23k £7.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k N/A N/A N/A