CHRISTCHURCH UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a programme of educational and leisure activity for those no longer in full time work, comparable to local U3A's nationwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 19 March 2002: Standard registration
- CHRSITCHURCH U3A (Working name)
- CHRISTCHURCH U3A (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Bell | Chair | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary McCulloch | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lady Susan Crosoer | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Peterkin | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Elaine Trayler | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Sherman | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Catherine Smith | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Auriel Fillery | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Watton | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALLAN FAIRBAIRN | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN JOAN LANCASTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.62k | £22.88k | £55.54k | £47.66k | £131.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.49k | £14.94k | £49.90k | £43.07k | £120.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2023
(These accounts |
07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2003 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED ON 12 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCAITON AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN CHRISTCHURCH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
CHRISTCHURCH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Epicentre
Druitt Hall Approach
High street
Christchurch
Dorset
BH23:1AB
- Phone:
- 01202480027
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window