THE BRAVO TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 03 April 2002: Standard registration
- 28 November 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 09 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM BULLYING IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF BULLYING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HEREFORDSHIRE WORCESTERSHIRE GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window