Accounts and annual returns ROSS-ON-WYE NEW LIFE CHURCH TRUST

Charity Number: 1090905
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 October 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 December 2016 On Time