Financial history ROSS-ON-WYE NEW LIFE CHURCH TRUST

Charity Number: 1090905
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £27.10k £30.03k £27.59k £24.42k £17.80k
Total expenditure £25.30k £30.17k £28.08k £18.45k £18.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A