HAUGHTON GREEN COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities, resources, events and or information in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants of our area of benefit. In addition, we act as an umbrella organisation, and we can assist in developing community groups where appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,188 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Tameside
Governance
- 20 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Fowler | Chair | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Howarth | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Walsh | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Blease | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Moss | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daryl Moore | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bown | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Edwards | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Fowler | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.54k | £43.83k | £39.37k | £37.46k | £38.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.44k | £12.40k | £11.17k | £17.94k | £18.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | N/A | £4.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
12 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAY 1991
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DENTON SOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY THE COURSE OF THE RIVER TAME FROM BEIGHT BRIDGE ON THE CHESHIRE BOUNDARY; ALONG THE PATH TO THE WEST OF CLARKE'S BRIDGE WHICH LEADS TO THE REAR OF MOORFIELD AVENUE; ALONG AND INCLUDING VAUDREY LANE; NORTH WEST ALONG STOCKPORT ROAD TO BEIGHT BRIDGE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FORM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE FORUM SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION
Area of benefit
DENTON SOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (SEE OBJECTS FOR FULL DETAILS)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haughton Green Community Centre
Tatton Road
Denton
MANCHESTER
M34 7PH
- Phone:
- 01613361905
- Email:
- info@hgcentre.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window