THE BRITISH CARDIOVASCULAR SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Set standards of clinical excellence for the benefit of patients; maintaining the highest standards in training, education and research; aims to be the primary source of professional advice and advocacy in the prevention, diagnosis and treatment of cardiovascular disease, and engage with government, patient groups, research councils, funding bodies and industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,824,882
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.52m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £127.83k | |
Other | £181.13k |
Total expenditure:
£2,960,044
Raising funds | £27.42k | |
Charitable activities | £2.93m | |
Other | £0 |
£303,950 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.42k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.93m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.42k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.93m | |
Retained for future use | £168.79k |
People

17 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 August 2002: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH CARDIAC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lois Isobel Whittaker | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NIKHIL PATEL | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Swanson | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abhishek Joshi | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mark Westwood | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Amitava Banerjee | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Shouvik Haldar | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cheryl Lee | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andre Ng | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Archbold | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Lawrence | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61m | £2.08m | £2.28m | £2.75m | £2.82m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60m | £2.09m | £2.26m | £2.90m | £2.96m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.39m | £1.95m | £2.06m | £2.50m | £2.52m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £133.06k | £102.36k | £108.07k | £117.44k | £127.83k | |
|
Income - Other | £29.71k | £18.07k | £107.45k | £137.57k | £181.13k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.58m | £2.07m | £2.23m | £2.87m | £2.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £18.76k | £24.12k | £28.36k | £27.50k | £27.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £83.69k | £0 | £138.77k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £18.76k | £24.12k | £28.36k | £27.50k | £27.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £1.57m | £1.53m | £1.54m | £1.52m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.30m | £4.74m | £5.60m | £4.97m | £5.12m | |
|
Other assets | £1.26m | £1.27m | £934.46k | £869.21k | £954.13k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £647.05k | £596.29k | £585.94k | £757.29k | £810.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 June 2021 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 June 2021 | 226 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JANUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 MAY 2002 AND 26 APRIL 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 NOV 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO UNDERTAKE OR PROMOTE WITH RESPECT TO DISEASES OF THE HEART OR CIRCULATION ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE AND IN EACH CASE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE PROMOTION AND EVALUATION OF BEST PRACTICE IN RELATION TO THE TREATMENT OF SUCH DISEASES; 2. MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 3. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM SUCH DISEASES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 FITZROY SQUARE
LONDON
W1T 5HW
- Phone:
- 02073833887
- Email:
- finance@bcs.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window