THE MEMORIAL FREE CHURCH, OAKAMOOR

Charity number: 1091555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church Activities, religious, social and personal. Area of Operation: Oakamoor and District in the Staffordshire Moorlands.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £45,644
Total expenditure: £54,088

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 April 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HENRY ALFRED BOLTON Chair
None on record
FRANCIS EDWARD KENNAWAY BOLTON Trustee 08 October 2016
None on record
MAJOR REBECCA MARTHA WILSON Trustee 02 April 2016
None on record
DOROTHY CLOWES Trustee 11 August 2013
None on record
JOHN MICHAEL REDFEARN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.84k £28.42k £31.64k £34.68k £45.64k
Total expenditure £27.96k £50.54k £19.06k £31.36k £54.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 RIVERSIDE
CHURNET VIEW ROAD
OAKAMOOR
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST10 3AE
Phone:
01538702678
Website:

No information available