Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST LEVAN
Charity number: 1091783

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA RUDGE BA PGCE MA | Chair | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Knight | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Knight | Trustee | 14 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev MICHAEL WESTRAN SEARLE LLB DIP TH | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR SALLY SCOTT | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET HUGH-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.