Financial history ADA ADULTS DISABILITY ARTS

Charity number: 1097032
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £2.29k £2.40k £2.86k £4.07k £991
Total expenditure £2.63k £2.19k £2.72k £3.00k £2.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A